Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pirotto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1892Born
30 Jun 191825.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 195866.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
16 Nov 195866.2Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
14 Dec 197482.3RetiredBishop of Troia, Italy
19 Jan 198289.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pirotto
Bishop Antonio Pirotto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCairo Montenotte

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018