Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arrigo Pintonello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1908BornPadova
9 Oct 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
4 Nov 195345.2AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
4 Nov 195345.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Arcadia
30 Nov 195345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Arcadia
1 May 196556.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Velletri, Italy
12 Sep 196759.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
25 Jun 197162.9ResignedBishop of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
8 Jul 200192.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arrigo Pintonello:
Archbishop Arrigo Pintonello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013