Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Leo O’Reilly

Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1944 Born
15 Jun 196925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
20 Nov 199652.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
2 Feb 199752.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
16 Oct 199854.5SucceededBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
31 Dec 201874.7ResignedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Philip Leo O’Reilly
Bishop Philip Leo O’Reilly (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilsherdany
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick and Saint Felim, Cathedral, Cavan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kilmore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,919
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Dec 2018

Quantcast