Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph MacKiernan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1926BornStradrinan
17 Jun 195125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
11 Oct 197246.7AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
10 Dec 197246.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
16 Oct 199872.7ResignedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
23 Dec 200579.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph MacKiernan:
Bishop Francis Joseph MacKiernan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013