Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Obanyi Sagwe

Bishop of Kakamega, Kenya

Apostolic Administrator of Bungoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1967² Born
25 Oct 199629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kisii, Kenya
5 Dec 201447.9AppointedBishop of Kakamega, Kenya
7 Mar 201548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kakamega, Kenya
23 Jun 201851.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bungoma, Kenya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Obanyi Sagwe
Bishop Joseph Obanyi Sagwe (born 1967) Bishop of Kakamega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKebiro
Ordained BishopBukhungu Stadium, Kakamega, Diocese of Kakamega

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kakamega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2014
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,380
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 5 Jan 2020

Quantcast