Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mairura Okemwa

Bishop of Kisii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1954 BornNyabururu
27 Oct 198733.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kisii, Kenya
19 Dec 199440.5AppointedBishop of Kisii, Kenya
21 Jul 199541.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kisii, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mairura Okemwa:
Bishop Joseph Mairura Okemwa (born ) Bishop of Kisii

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kisii.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,599
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013