Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Kipkoech Arap Rotich

Bishop of Kericho, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1957 Born
18 Nov 198326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nakuru, Kenya
9 Mar 199638.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nairobi, Kenya
9 Mar 199638.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
3 Jul 199638.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
29 Aug 199740.0AppointedBishop of Kenya, Military
30 Dec 201659.4ResignedBishop of Kenya, Military
14 Dec 201962.3AppointedBishop of Kericho, Kenya
15 Feb 202062.5InstalledBishop of Kericho, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Alfred Kipkoech Arap Rotich
Bishop Alfred Kipkoech Arap Rotich (born ) Bishop of Kericho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongisa
Ordained BishopEastleigh Air Base, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kericho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,768
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 4 Jan 2020
  • i: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast