Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunatus M. Lukanima

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arusha, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1940Born
8 Dec 196828.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 198948.2AppointedBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
13 Aug 198948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
20 Jul 199857.6ResignedBishop of Arusha, Tanzania
12 Mar 201473.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Arusha, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Fortunatus M. Lukanima
Bishop Fortunatus M. Lukanima (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arusha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrondo

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,276
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 12 Mar 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast