Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Longinus Atundo

Deceased

Bishop of Bungoma, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1936Born
30 Dec 196428.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 198751.3AppointedBishop of Bungoma, Kenya
28 Jun 198751.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bungoma, Kenya
15 Nov 199660.8DiedBishop of Bungoma, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Longinus Atundo
Bishop Longinus Atundo (born , died ) Bishop of Bungoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLunganyiro

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,256
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018