Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silas Silvius Njiru

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meru, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1928Born
17 Dec 195527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Meru, Kenya
2 Oct 197546.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meru, Kenya
2 Oct 197546.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
1 Jan 197647.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba
9 Dec 197648.1AppointedBishop of Meru, Kenya
18 Mar 200475.4RetiredBishop of Meru, Kenya
28 Apr 202091.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Meru, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Silas Silvius Njiru
Bishop Silas Silvius Njiru (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKevote
Ordained BishopStade, Meru, Diocese of Meru
Death PlaceHospital, Rivoli, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Consolata Missionaries, Cemetery, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,136
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2020
  • loc: CB, 29 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Apr 2020

Quantcast