Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Christopher Mahon, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodwar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1922BornKillurine, Ireland
28 Mar 194825.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
16 Jan 196845.1AppointedPrefect of Lodwar, Kenya
30 Jan 197855.1AppointedBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
25 Apr 197855.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
17 Feb 200077.1RetiredBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
10 Nov 200481.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodwar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John Christopher Mahon:
Bishop John Christopher Mahon S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodwar

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013