Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph McCarthy, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1896BornMiltown Malbay, Ireland
24 Jun 192529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Jul 194650.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
11 Jul 194650.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cercina
27 Oct 194650.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cercina
25 Mar 195356.9AppointedArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
24 Oct 197175.5RetiredArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
13 Jan 198386.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John Joseph McCarthy:
Archbishop John Joseph McCarthy C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013