Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Gerhard Hilhorst, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro

Titular Bishop of Arsamosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1895BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
27 Aug 192226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Feb 193438.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bagamoyo, Tanzania
26 Feb 193438.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
25 Apr 193438.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
25 Mar 195357.2AppointedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
12 Dec 195357.9ResignedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
12 Dec 195357.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsamosata
11 Aug 195458.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Morogoro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Gerhard Hilhorst:
Bishop Bernhard Gerhard Hilhorst C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015