Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Dominicus Josephus Aengenent

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1873BornDelft
3 Apr 189724.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 192855.3AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
25 Jul 192855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
3 Sep 193562.5DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Dominicus Josephus Aengenent:
Bishop Johannes Dominicus Josephus Aengenent (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013