Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Mchonde

Deceased

Bishop of Mahenge, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1912Born
24 Aug 194835.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
24 Mar 195643.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
24 Mar 195643.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
21 Sep 195644.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
21 Apr 196451.6AppointedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
13 Jun 196956.7DiedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Elias Mchonde
Bishop Elias Mchonde (born Sep 1912, died ) Bishop of Mahenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSofi

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 83
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast