Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbanus Joseph Kioko

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Machakos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1928BornKilungu
8 Jan 196132.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 197345.2AppointedBishop of Machakos, Kenya
7 Oct 197345.4Ordained BishopBishop of Machakos, Kenya
15 Mar 200374.8RetiredBishop of Machakos, Kenya
2 Mar 200879.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Machakos, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Urbanus Joseph Kioko:
Bishop Urbanus Joseph Kioko (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Machakos

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013