Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antoine Horner

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Zanguebar, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1827Born
15 Apr 185426.8Ordained PriestPriest
186840.5AppointedPrefect of Zanguebar, Kenya
187749.5ResignedPrefect of Zanguebar, Kenya
8 May 188052.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Zanguebar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Antoine Horner
Father Antoine Horner (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Zanguebar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchoenenbourg

  • a priest for 26.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018