Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Étienne (Edmond Martin) Baur, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Zanguebar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1835BornKatzenthal, France
5 Apr 186226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
187135.6AppointedSuperior of Zanguebar, Kenya
188044.6AppointedPrefect of Zanguebar, Kenya
1883¹47.6ResignedPrefect of Zanguebar, Kenya
29 Nov 191378.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Zanguebar, Kenya

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Étienne (Edmond Martin) Baur:
Father Étienne (Edmond Martin) Baur C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Zanguebar

  • a priest for 51.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015