Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Prézeau, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Shiré

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1871BornSaint-Hilaire-de-Talmont, France
3 Dec 190331.9AppointedPrefect of Shiré, Malawi
15 Apr 190836.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shiré, Malawi
15 Apr 190836.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
4 Oct 190836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
2 Dec 190937.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Shiré, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Auguste Prézeau:
Bishop Auguste Prézeau S.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Shiré

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013