Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mogadiscio

Dioecesis Mogadiscensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 20 November 1975
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Somalia
  • Square Kilometers: 637,657 (246,295 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 273, Ahmed Bin Idris, Mogadiscio, Somalia
  • Telephone: (01)20.184; 20.213
  • Fax: 35.48.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Benadir
21 January 1904ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Benadir (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio
15 December 1927ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Benadir Vicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio
Diocese of Mogadiscio
20 November 1975ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio Diocese of Mogadiscio

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio
19508,5001,200,000.7%16165312014011ap1951
19702,6233,000,000.1%18181452594ap1971
Diocese of Mogadiscio
19802,1003,540,000.1%663508682ap1981
19902,0004,810,000.0%1454005484ap1991
19991006,500,000.0%11100231ap2000
20001006,500,000.0%11250231ap2003
20031006,500,000.0%1110013ap2004
20041006,500,000.0%1110041ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 4 Nov 2012