Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Silvio Zocchetta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia

Titular Bishop of Sfasferia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1920Born
17 Mar 194524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Feb 196847.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mogadiscio, Somalia
16 Feb 196847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
23 May 196847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
19 Oct 197050.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
22 Jan 197352.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Silvio Zocchetta
Bishop Antonio Silvio Zocchetta O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecchio Precalcino
Ordained BishopSant'Angelo, Church, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Mogadiscio, Vicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio
Buried Place (Current)Sant'Antonio di Padova, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast