Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Fulgenzio Lazzati, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1882Born
17 Jun 190522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 193148.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
14 Jul 193148.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
8 Nov 193149.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
24 May 193249.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Fulgenzio Lazzati
Bishop Francesco Fulgenzio Lazzati O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerro Maggiore, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Mogadiscio, Vicariate Apostolic of Mogadiscio
Buried Place (Current)Sant'Antonio di Padova, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 60
  • loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast