Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Bertin, O.F.M.

Bishop of Djibouti

Apostolic Administrator of Mogadiscio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1946 BornGalzignano, Italy
7 Jun 197528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Apr 199043.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mogadiscio, Somalia
13 Mar 200154.2AppointedBishop of Djibouti
25 May 200154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Djibouti

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Bertin:
Bishop Giorgio Bertin O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Djibouti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Djibouti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,978

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015