Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Salvatore Colombo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mogadiscio, Somalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1922Born
20 Aug 194421.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
6 Apr 194623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Nov 197553.0AppointedBishop of Mogadiscio, Somalia
16 Mar 197653.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mogadiscio, Somalia
9 Jul 198966.6DiedBishop of Mogadiscio, Somalia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Salvatore Colombo
Bishop Pietro Salvatore Colombo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mogadiscio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarate Brianza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti Ambrogio e Simpliciano, Church, Carate Brianza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceMogadiscio, Diocese of Mogadiscio
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Mogadiscio, Diocese of Mogadiscio
Buried Place (Current)Sant'Antonio di Padova, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • prof: CB, 26 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast