Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Stanislaus Wilson, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

Titular Bishop of Acmonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1884BornQueenstown, Ireland
28 Oct 191329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 Jan 192439.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bagamoyo, Tanzania
4 Jan 192439.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
9 Jun 192440.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
23 May 193349.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
16 Apr 193651.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
28 Oct 193854.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Stanislaus Wilson:
Bishop Bartholomew Stanislaus Wilson C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sierra Leone

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013