Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Iringa

Dioecesis Iringaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Songea
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 43,318 (16,731 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Residence, P.O. Box 133, Iringa, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (026)2702.772; 2700.635
  • Fax: 2700.650

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
3 March 1922ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa (erected)
28 January 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Iringa
8 January 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Iringa Vicariate Apostolic of Iringa
Diocese of Iringa
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Iringa Diocese of Iringa
16 February 1968Territory LostDiocese of Iringa
Territorial Abbey of Peramiho
Diocese of Njombe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Iringa
195027,443400,0006.9%240426537719ap1951
Diocese of Iringa
1969174,581422,57441.3%1647632,7718922928ap1971
1980225,387658,00034.3%2036564,0249328828ap1981
1990367,132771,00047.6%3249814,532111935230ap1991
1999518,3722,171,24123.9%53481015,132113448532ap2000
2000534,2712,214,66624.1%58521104,857114151833ap2001
2001550,3242,258,95924.4%54481025,395114851833ap2002
2002555,2272,281,54824.3%60471075,189114851333ap2003
2003568,3492,305,37324.7%57451025,572115550233ap2004
2004574,0322,309,98324.9%53521055,466116752733ap2005
2006588,4392,367,96224.9%5339926,396120654933ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 May 2013