Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Songea

Archidioecesis Songeanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Damian Denis Dalu, Archbishop
  • Tarcisius Ngalalekumtwa, Apostolic Administrator
  • Norbert Wendelin Mtega, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 November 1987
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 38,600 (14,909 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.songea.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 152, Songea, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (025)260.2004
  • Fax: 260.2354

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lindi
12 November 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam Prefecture Apostolic of Lindi (erected)
Diocese of Lindi
15 December 1927ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lindi Diocese of Lindi
22 December 1931Territory LostDiocese of Lindi Territorial Abbey of Ndanda (erected)
Territorial Abbey of Peramiho
23 December 1931Name ChangedDiocese of Lindi Territorial Abbey of Peramiho
16 February 1968Territory LostDiocese of Iringa
Territorial Abbey of Peramiho
Diocese of Njombe (erected)
Diocese of Songea
6 February 1969Name ChangedTerritorial Abbey of Peramiho Diocese of Songea
22 December 1986Territory LostDiocese of Songea Diocese of Mbinga (erected)
Archdiocese of Songea
18 November 1987ElevatedDiocese of Songea Archdiocese of Songea

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Abbey of Peramiho
1950130,148250,00052.1%464681,91313414529ap1951
Diocese of Songea
1970212,457321,50066.1%50641141,86314827941ap1971
1980285,200441,60064.6%70471172,43714231343ap1981
Archdiocese of Songea
1990190,862356,60353.5%4338812,35619538923ap1991
1999231,324459,81750.3%5828862,68918742225ap2000
2000238,910474,98950.3%6332952,51418843525ap2001
2001244,411511,38047.8%70521222,00321043825ap2002
2002245,411512,00047.9%59591182,07923043225ap2003
2003223,991464,82148.2%61471082,07321949726ap2004
2004223,111476,16146.9%62431052,12422745827ap2005
2010273,360529,00051.7%5841992,76124143227ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Mar 2014