Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eberhard (Hermann) Spiess, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Songea, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Cemerinianus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1902Born
2 Jun 192523.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 193027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Sep 195351.3AppointedAbbot of Peramiho, Tanzania
23 Sep 195351.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
3 Dec 195351.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
6 Feb 196966.7ResignedAbbot of Songea, Tanzania
17 Sep 199088.3DiedAbbot Emeritus of Songea, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Eberhard (Hermann) Spiess
Bishop Eberhard (Hermann) Spiess O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Songea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErtingen, Germany

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,116
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018