Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tabora

Archidioecesis Taboraensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul R. Ruzoka, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 76,151 (29,413 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Private Bag, P.O. Tabora, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (026)2605.608
  • Fax: 2604.000

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Unianyembé
11 January 1887ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Unianyembé (erected) ((or 30 Dec 1886))
Vicariate Apostolic of Tabora
31 May 1925Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Unianyembé Vicariate Apostolic of Tabora
8 April 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tabora
Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukoba (erected)
Archdiocese of Tabora
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tabora Archdiocese of Tabora
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Dodoma
Diocese of Mbeya
Diocese of Mbulu
Archdiocese of Tabora
Diocese of Singida (erected)
11 November 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Tabora Diocese of Kahama (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tabora
195021,649431,0005.0%2436603608515ap1951
Archdiocese of Tabora
197071,238605,00011.8%3339729894513923ap1971
1980106,5431,769,0006.0%4435791,3484515124ap1981
1990136,405812,00016.8%1825433,1723010520ap1991
1999243,6181,408,07217.3%3826643,8063716820ap2000
2000245,7331,409,27417.4%4224663,7233617221ap2001
2001246,7301,409,32317.5%4427713,4753915521ap2002
2002252,9691,419,72417.8%4327703,6133815521ap2003
2003256,9841,426,84218.0%4722693,7243415622ap2004
2004257,3901,426,99818.0%4321644,0213215922ap2005
2010245,0001,812,00013.5%4018584,2243324422ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 10 Dec 2012