Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Runangaza Ruzoka

Archbishop of Tabora, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1948 Born
20 Jul 197527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kigoma, Tanzania
10 Nov 198941.8AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
6 Jan 199042.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
25 Nov 200658.8AppointedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
28 Jan 200759.0InstalledArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Paul Runangaza Ruzoka
Archbishop Paul Runangaza Ruzoka (born 1948) Archbishop of Tabora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyakayenzi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tabora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,682
  • mn: CB, 30 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018