Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Daniel Nsabi

Deceased

Bishop of Kigoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1920Born
15 Aug 195030.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 196949.6AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
22 Feb 197049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
16 Aug 198969.3DiedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Daniel Nsabi
Bishop Alphonse Daniel Nsabi (born , died ) Bishop of Kigoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlobi Nzega
Ordained BishopKigoma, Diocese of Kigoma

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast