Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Holmes-Siedle, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kigoma, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Árd Mór


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1910Born
29 Jun 193524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Jul 194635.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Karema, Tanzania
11 Jul 194635.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
8 Dec 194636.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
25 Mar 195342.3AppointedBishop of Karema, Tanzania
5 Aug 195847.7AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
15 Dec 196959.1ResignedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
15 Dec 196959.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Mór
22 May 199584.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kigoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for James Holmes-Siedle
Bishop James Holmes-Siedle M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kigoma

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenarth, South Glamorgan, Great Britain

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast