Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Leo Parker

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1887Born
29 May 191527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
14 Dec 194052.9AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
11 Feb 194153.1Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
17 Jan 196779.0RetiredBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
17 Jan 196779.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Magarmel
7 Dec 197082.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Magarmel
25 Mar 197587.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Leo Parker (VIAF: 89315536)
Bishop Thomas Leo Parker (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceSt. John, Convent, Kiln Green, Reading, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,941, Number 3
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 162
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 265, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 527, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast