Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Alexander Grant

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1906Born
16 Jun 193528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Northampton, England, Great Britain
6 Feb 196154.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
6 Feb 196154.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
25 Apr 196154.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
14 Mar 196760.3AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
16 Feb 198275.3RetiredBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
24 Apr 198982.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Alexander Grant
Bishop Charles Alexander Grant (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambridge, Cambridgeshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and English Martyrs, Church, Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceSt. John, Convent, Kiln Green, Reading, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Woburn Sands, Milton Keynes, Buckinghamshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 105
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast