Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marko Mihayo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tabora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1907²BornUshetu
18 Aug 194033.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tabora, Tanzania
21 Jun 196053.5AppointedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
18 Sep 196053.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
9 Jul 196962.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mbulu, Tanzania
Oct 1971³64.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Mbulu, Tanzania
9 Mar 198578.2RetiredArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
13 Mar 199588.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tabora, Tanzania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marko Mihayo:
Archbishop Marko Mihayo (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tabora

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013