Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Roman Mlola, ALCP/OSS

Bishop of Kigoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1966 Born
12 Jul 199731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Spiritus Sancti
10 Jul 201448.5AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
26 Oct 201448.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Roman Mlola
Bishop Joseph Roman Mlola ALCP/OSS (born ) Bishop of Kigoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMashati Rombo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kigoma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 23 Aug 2014
  • c2: CB, 23 Oct 2014
  • c34: CB, 27 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast