Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gitega

Archidioecesis Kitegaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Simon Ntamwana, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burundi
  • Square Kilometers: 3,879 (1,498 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 118, Gitega, Burundi
  • Telephone: (040)2160; 2795
  • Fax: 2620

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu
12 December 1912ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Urundi and Kivu
1921Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kivu Vicariate Apostolic of Urundi and Kivu
Vicariate Apostolic of Urundi
25 April 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Urundi and Kivu Vicariate Apostolic of Urundi
14 July 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Urundi Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kitega
14 July 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Urundi Vicariate Apostolic of Kitega
11 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kitega
Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi
Vicariate Apostolic of Usumbura (erected)
Archdiocese of Gitega
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kitega Archdiocese of Gitega
6 June 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Gitega Diocese of Bururi (erected)
13 April 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Gitega
Diocese of Ngozi
Diocese of Ruyigi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kitega
1950394,5061,000,48939.4%2470944,1962412219ap1951
Archdiocese of Gitega
1970514,213816,10063.0%47581054,897103154165ap1971
1980577,555754,99376.5%4131728,02176162112ap1981
1990695,218901,99277.1%4354814,4835220223ap1991
1999789,4981,008,21678.3%57106711,7836424625ap2000
2000808,6481,024,81178.9%7414889,1896024125ap2001
2001759,656980,95277.4%7213858,93715634027ap2002
2002730,3581,006,91972.5%7814927,9386124728ap2003
2003811,2851,056,22076.8%65137810,4017932028ap2004
2004835,5361,098,71376.0%8113948,8885530828ap2005
2006878,3131,130,95977.7%94131078,2087933629ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 16 Sep 2012