Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Ntamwana

Archbishop of Gitega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1946 BornMukenke
24 Mar 197427.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 198842.4AppointedBishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
5 Feb 198942.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
24 Jan 199750.6AppointedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Simon Ntamwana:
Archbishop Simon Ntamwana (born ) Archbishop of Gitega

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gitega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,039
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,452
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 29 Jan 2014