Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Bizimana

Bishop of Ngozi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1965 Born
20 Aug 199429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ngozi, Burundi
7 Dec 201348.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bubanza, Burundi
1 Mar 201448.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bubanza, Burundi
17 Dec 201954.7AppointedBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
25 Jan 202054.8InstalledBishop of Ngozi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Georges Bizimana
Bishop Georges Bizimana (born ) Bishop of Ngozi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuraniro
Ordained BishopStade de la ville, Bubanza, Diocese of Bubanza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ngozi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,105
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast