Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bururi

Dioecesis Bururiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Venant Bacinoni, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 6 June 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bujumbura
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burundi
  • Square Kilometers: 5,776 (2,230 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche de Bururi, D.S. 140, Bujumbura, Burundi
  • Telephone: 22.50.23.27

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6 June 1961ErectedArchdiocese of Gitega Diocese of Bururi (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Bururi (from Gitega)
17 January 2009Territory LostDiocese of Bururi
Diocese of Ruyigi
Diocese of Rutana (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1969136,206461,69029.5%742492,779464912ap1971
1980154,200427,70036.1%722295,317255313ap1981
1990215,447656,05632.8%221239,36746013ap1991
1998309,024782,37739.5%332358,82997432ap2001
2001309,024782,37739.5%342368,58497432ap2002
2002370,841900,01641.2%68685,45357718ap2003
2003397,903916,60843.4%53537,50756718ap2004
2004412,526969,15742.6%59596,99158818ap2005
2006413,960966,39142.8%76765,44659820ap2007
2012467,0001,256,00037.2%701716,57769318ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013