Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bujumbura

Archidioecesis Buiumburaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Evariste Ngoyagoye, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 November 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burundi
  • Square Kilometers: 2,200 (849 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 690, Bujumbura, Burundi
  • Telephone: 22.23.14.76
  • Fax: 22.23.11.65

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Usumbura
11 June 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kitega
Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi
Vicariate Apostolic of Usumbura (erected)
Diocese of Usumbura
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Usumbura Diocese of Usumbura
Diocese of Bujumbura
9 October 1964Name ChangedDiocese of Usumbura Diocese of Bujumbura
7 June 1980Territory LostDiocese of Bujumbura Diocese of Bubanza (erected)
Archdiocese of Bujumbura
25 November 2006ElevatedDiocese of Bujumbura Archdiocese of Bujumbura

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bujumbura
1970476,819890,77153.5%51011064,498146297148ap1971
1980573,975888,00064.6%53531065,41411124326ap1981
1990685,000953,00071.9%5019699,9276317823ap1991
1999882,0001,365,00064.6%6331949,3829926625ap2000
2000802,0001,405,95057.0%61391008,02012430125ap2001
20011,004,0001,420,00070.7%64381029,84311728525ap2002
20021,050,5601,465,94771.7%73431169,05614032425ap2003
20031,097,4271,512,03072.6%76431199,22214628725ap2004
20041,117,9081,596,56670.0%78471258,94315824526ap2005
Archdiocese of Bujumbura
20061,294,6461,693,00076.5%94441389,38116432126ap2007
20121,542,0001,968,00078.4%125511768,76115249129ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013