Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gervais Banshimiyubusa

Archbishop of Bujumbura, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1952 Born
4 Jul 198128.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 200047.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ngozi, Burundi
16 Sep 200048.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ngozi, Burundi
14 Dec 200250.2SucceededBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
24 Mar 201865.5AppointedArchbishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
24 Mar 201865.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ngozi, Burundi
25 Jan 202067.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ngozi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Gervais Banshimiyubusa (VIAF: 41079149)
Archbishop Gervais Banshimiyubusa (born ) Archbishop of Bujumbura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGisuru
Ordained BishopOpen Air, stade Muremura, Ngozi, Diocese of Ngozi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bujumbura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,838
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2018
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast