Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas Kaburungu

Bishop Emeritus of Ngozi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1935 Born
3 Sep 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ngozi, Burundi
5 Sep 196832.9AppointedBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
25 Jan 196933.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
14 Dec 200267.1ResignedBishop of Ngozi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Stanislas Kaburungu
Bishop Stanislas Kaburungu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ngozi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGisanze
Ordained BishopNgozi, Diocese of Ngozi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ngozi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Apr 2020

Quantcast