Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Bududira

Deceased

Bishop of Bururi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1934Born
8 Jul 196328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bururi, Burundi
17 Sep 197339.1AppointedBishop of Bururi, Burundi
30 Nov 197339.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bururi, Burundi
19 Nov 200571.2DiedBishop of Bururi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Bernard Bududira
Bishop Bernard Bududira (born Aug 1934, died ) Bishop of Bururi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMushikanwa
Ordained BishopBururi, Diocese of Bururi

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast