Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ngozi

Dioecesis Ngoziensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gervais Banshimiyubusa, Bishop
  • Stanislas Kaburungu, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Gitega
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Burundi
  • Square Kilometers: 3,810 (1,471 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 2, Ngozi, Burundi; D.S. 121, Bujumbura, Burundi
  • Telephone: (030)2180
  • Fax: 2254

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi
14 July 1949ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Urundi Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi (erected)
11 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kitega
Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi
Vicariate Apostolic of Usumbura (erected)
Diocese of Ngozi
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ngozi Diocese of Ngozi
5 September 1968Territory LostDiocese of Ngozi Diocese of Muyinga (erected)
13 April 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Gitega
Diocese of Ngozi
Diocese of Ruyigi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ngozi
1950249,742694,00536.0%647534,7123913ap1951
Diocese of Ngozi
1969452,022603,53874.9%3437716,3665710015ap1971
1980567,312812,60069.8%36165210,9094211417ap1981
1988675,566858,36878.7%2563121,792158517ap1991
1998700,000920,00076.1%38114914,2852413617ap2001
2001790,0001,039,07876.0%31104119,2682813818ap2002
2003937,3731,109,09484.5%43155816,1614619918ap2004

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 29 Jan 2014