Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Ntagwarara

Bishop of Bubanza, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1947 Born
15 Aug 197628.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 199750.0AppointedBishop of Bubanza, Burundi
14 Feb 199850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bubanza, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Jean Ntagwarara
Bishop Jean Ntagwarara (born ) Bishop of Bubanza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBugera

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bubanza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018