Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venant Bacinoni

Bishop of Bururi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1940 BornKirisi
20 Apr 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bururi, Burundi
25 Jun 200767.3AppointedBishop of Bururi, Burundi
8 Sep 200767.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bururi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Venant Bacinoni:
Bishop Venant Bacinoni (born ) Bishop of Bururi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bururi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013