Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nestor Bihonda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Muyinga, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1924Born
8 Nov 195329.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 196541.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gitega, Burundi
6 May 196541.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Siminina
15 Aug 196541.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siminina
5 Sep 196844.6AppointedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
25 Mar 197753.2ResignedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
2 Oct 198662.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Muyinga, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Nestor Bihonda
Bishop Nestor Bihonda (born 1924, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Muyinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGisanze

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018