Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Ntuyahaga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bujumbura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1912³BornNyarugati
26 Jul 194128.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 195946.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Usumbura, Burundi
11 Jun 195946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
11 Oct 195946.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
10 Nov 195946.9AppointedBishop of Usumbura, Burundi
9 Oct 196451.9AppointedBishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
14 Nov 198876.0RetiredBishop of Bujumbura, Burundi
11 Jun 200289.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bujumbura, Burundi

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Ntuyahaga:
Bishop Michel Ntuyahaga (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bujumbura

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 85
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013