Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvator Niciteretse

Bishop of Bururi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1958 Born
9 Jul 198930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bururi, Burundi
15 Feb 202061.5AppointedBishop of Bururi, Burundi
18 Apr 202061.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bururi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Salvator Niciteretse
Bishop Salvator Niciteretse (born ) Bishop of Bururi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRutwenzi, Diocese of Bururi
Ordained BishopKabuye stadium, Bururi, Diocese of Bururi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bururi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2020
  • ob: AM, 4 Mar 2020
  • c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Apr 2020

Quantcast